NV AB254 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; prohibiting certain entities from compensating a student athlete for the use of the name, image or likeness of the student athlete; providing that a student athlete may be compensated for the use of the name, image or likeness of the student athlete by certain organizations; directing the Legislative Committee on Education to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study relating to the use of the name, image or likeness of a student athlete; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing collegiate athletics. (BDR 34-879)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2021-04-22SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyTo Senate.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-20AssemblyTo printer.
2021-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.)
2021-04-19AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 201.)
2021-04-19AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-12AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback