NV AB253 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires reports of federal revenues received by state agencies, institutions of higher education, school districts and charter schools. (BDR 31-165)
Title
Requires reports of federal revenues received by state agencies, institutions of higher education, school districts and charter schools. (BDR 31-165)
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] | Rep. Cresent Hardy [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] | Rep. Tom Grady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-13 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=600 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/AB/AB253.pdf |