NV AB247 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; updating the signatories to the Western Regional Education Compact; changing the name of the Office of the Western Regional Education Compact to the Nevada Office of the Western Interstate Commission for Higher Education; revising provisions relating to the powers and duties of the Nevada State Commissioners and the Nevada Office; revising provisions relating to financial support received by participants enrolled in programs under the terms of the Compact; revising provisions relating to certain accounts administered by the Nevada Office; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Western Regional Education Compact. (BDR 34-472)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 407. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 98.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |