NV AB245 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 200.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 200.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public affairs; authorizing certain notaries public to receive fees for performing notarial acts in addition to fees for performing document preparation services; increasing certain fees which may be charged by a notary public; increasing certain fees required to register or renew a registration to engage in the business of a document preparation service; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Increases certain fees relating to notaries public and document preparation services. (BDR 19-983)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 200. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Action reconsidered. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.) |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 328.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |