NV AB244 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 503. (Effective June 15, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 503. (Effective June 15, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; establishing the substantive rights of a person compelled to submit to a mental or physical examination under certain circumstances; authorizing a person who has been aggrieved by the violation of certain rights to institute an action for injunctive and other appropriate relief in certain circumstances; repealing provisions relating to a mental or physical examination required of certain persons in a civil action; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes certain rights of persons compelled to submit to certain mental or physical examinations. (BDR 54-819)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Chapter 503. (Effective June 15, 2023) |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 738 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 738.) To printer. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.) To Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 318.) To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |