NV AB240 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to cannabis; establishing and revising certain requirements relating to the cultivation, growth or production of cannabis by certain persons; authorizing a sheriff and health authority to enforce certain provisions relating to the cultivation, growth and production of cannabis; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the cultivation, growing or production of cannabis by certain persons. (BDR 56-509)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-15Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2023-03-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2023-03-03AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2023-03-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback