NV AB240 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-821)
Title
Revises provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-821)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment No. 913 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 913 not concurred in. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 913.) To printer. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 546.) To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |