NV AB237 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to real property; establishing a process for the Real Estate Division of the Department of Business and Industry to investigate complaints alleging violations of provisions governing certain fees which may be imposed or charged by a unit-owners' association for a common-interest community; revising provisions pertaining to the applicability of certain provisions of law governing the creation, alteration and termination of common-interest communities; prohibiting a unit-owners' association from imposing or charging certain fees other than or in excess of those that the association is expressly authorized or required by statute to impose or charge; increasing the cost of a demand or intent to lien letter; revising provisions relating to the exemption from providing certain information in the case of certain dispositions of a unit in a common-interest community; requiring certain notice to be provided for a foreclosure sale; revising provisions relating to the sale of real property consisting of several lots or parcels; revising provisions regarding the ascertainment of title of real property to be partitioned; making certain technical changes and removing certain obsolete provisions; revising provisions concerning instruments that subordinate or waive priority of a mortgage or deed of trust of, lien upon or interest in real property; revising provisions relating to certain liens on real property; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises various provisions relating to real property. (BDR 10-22)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 268.
2021-05-27AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-25AssemblySenate Amendment No. 658 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-05-21SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 658.) To printer.
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-04-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2021-04-16SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-14AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 91.) To printer.
2021-04-13AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2021-04-13AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2021-04-13AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback