NV AB237 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes counties to issue securities for projects and programs concerning public water and sewer systems. (BDR 20-243)
Title
Authorizes counties to issue securities for projects and programs concerning public water and sewer systems. (BDR 20-243)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135. | |
2011-05-27 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-25 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-18 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-14 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-04-22 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2011-04-18 | Taken from General File. | |
2011-04-15 | Read second time. | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-03-08 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |