NV AB235 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act. (BDR 3-714)
Title
Enacts the Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act. (BDR 3-714)
Sponsors
Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] | Rep. Lesley Cohen [D] | Sen. James Ohrenschall [D] | Rep. Justin Watkins [D] |
Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. Sandra Jauregui [D] | Rep. Steve Yeager [D] | Sen. Richard Segerblom [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 266.) To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |