NV AB23 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 105.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to transportation; authorizing the Department of Motor Vehicles to adopt regulations related to the operation and testing of certain electronically controlled vehicles and transportation devices other than autonomous vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Department of Motor Vehicles to adopt regulations relating to certain electronically controlled vehicles and transportation devices. (BDR 43-365)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24AssemblyChapter 105.
2019-05-23AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-22AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateRead second time.
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-22AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 344.) To printer.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback