NV AB227 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to contractors; setting forth the persons who may perform certain types of work for a contractor; revising the grounds for disciplinary action against a licensee by the State Contractors' Board; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to contractors. (BDR 54-720)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 518 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 518.) To printer. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 16, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |