NV AB226 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes; prohibiting certain entities or persons from requiring another person to undergo implantation of a microchip or other permanent identification marker; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain entities or persons from requiring another person to undergo implantation of a microchip or other permanent identification marker. (BDR 15-25)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 767.) To printer.
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 46.) To printer.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-25AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback