NV AB219 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal justice; authorizing the sealing of criminal records after a pardon; requiring the sealing of criminal records under certain circumstances; authorizing the appeal of certain petitions to seal criminal records; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the sealing of criminal records. (BDR 14-137)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 403.
2021-06-02AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-31AssemblySenate Amendment No. 862 concurred in. To enrollment.
2021-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2021-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly.
2021-05-31SenateTo printer.
2021-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
2021-05-31SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2021-05-31SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 862.)
2021-05-30SenateRead second time.
2021-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 7, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2021-05-27AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2021-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2021-04-19AssemblyTo committee.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 142.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2021-04-16AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-03-10AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-09AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback