NV AB215 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 198.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 198.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring the Department of Education to adopt regulations relating to the eligibility of certain persons to enroll in courses for an adult to earn a high school diploma; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the eligibility requirements for participation in courses for an adult to earn a high school diploma. (BDR 34-653)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 198. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 97.) To printer. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |