NV AB212 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 28. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to higher education; requiring the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada to establish certain policies and procedures that ensure certain students are able to access or obtain official and unofficial transcripts; prohibiting an institution with the Nevada System of Higher Education from charging students that owe a debt to the System or an institution within the System a higher fee to obtain a transcript; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions governing student transcripts. (BDR 34-523)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 28. (Effective July 1, 2023)
2023-05-23AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2023-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2023-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2023-05-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2023-05-15SenateRead second time.
2023-05-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-03-27SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2023-03-27SenateIn Senate.
2023-03-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2023-03-23AssemblyRead second time.
2023-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2023-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2023-02-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback