NV AB212 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to confidential information; authorizing certain persons who perform tasks related to code enforcement to obtain court orders requiring a county assessor, county recorder, the Secretary of State or a county or city clerk to maintain certain personal information in a confidential manner; authorizing such persons to request the Department of Motor Vehicles to display an alternate address on the person's driver's license, commercial driver's license or identification card; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the confidentiality of personal information of certain persons. (BDR 20-620)
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Edwards [R] | Rep. Brittney Miller [D] | Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] |
Sen. Keith Pickard [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 134. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 234.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |