NV AB209 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the distribution and sale of raw milk. (BDR 51-1011)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the distribution and sale of raw milk. (BDR 51-1011)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-06AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2013-05-31AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-28AssemblyTo enrollment.
2013-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2013-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2013-05-20SenateRead third time.
2013-05-18SenateRead second time.
2013-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-04-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2013-04-23SenateIn Senate.
2013-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2013-04-19AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 525.) To printer.
2013-04-18AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-03-08AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-07AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=520
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/AB/AB209.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/AB/AB209_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB19.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB19_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB19_EN.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/AB/AB209_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=381&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=209&fldBillname=AB209
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1981&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=209&fldBillname=AB209
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=381&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=19&fldBillname=SB19
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1981&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=19&fldBillname=SB19

Bill Comments

feedback