NV AB207 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Chapter 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to business entities; revising provisions concerning certain records required to be kept by certain business entities; revising provisions relating to the breach of a fiduciary duty by a director or officer of a corporation; revising provisions relating to the ability of a stockholder to dissent in certain circumstances; revising the definition of the term issuing corporation as it relates to the acquisition of a controlling interest therein; authorizing stockholders of a corporation to approve an amendment to the articles of incorporation in writing; requiring written notice to certain stockholders after the dissolution of a corporation approved by written consent of the stockholders thereof; revising provisions relating to the individual liability of a person acting as the alter ego of a corporation and applying such provisions to limited-liability companies; revising provisions concerning the indemnification of certain persons by a corporation; establishing provisions relating to the duties owed to certain limited-liability companies and certain other persons by a manager or managing member of the limited-liability company; establishing provisions relating to a series of members of a limited-liability company; establishing the circumstances under which the merger of a publicly traded corporation without the vote of the stockholders is authorized; revising provisions relating to limitations on the right of a stockholder to dissent; making various other changes relating to business entities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises various provisions relating to business entities. (BDR 7-146)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09AssemblyChapter 19.
2019-05-08AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-06AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 43.) To printer.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback