NV AB207 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning common-interest communities. (BDR 10-694)
Title
Makes various changes concerning common-interest communities. (BDR 10-694)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendment No. 609 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-05-18 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-05-18 | To committee. | |
2009-05-18 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-16 | Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 609.) | |
2009-05-16 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-05-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | To Senate. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-17 | To printer. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-17 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-17 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-04-17 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 354.) | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-17 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=419 |