NV AB203 | 2015 | 78th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Revises provisions pertaining to short-term lessors of vehicles. (BDR 43-572)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Revises provisions pertaining to short-term lessors of vehicles. (BDR 43-572)


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2015-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 520.
2015-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2015-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-05-30SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2015-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-29AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
2015-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2015-04-13AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2015-04-10AssemblyTo printer.
2015-04-10AssemblyExemption effective.
2015-04-10AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-04-10AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-04-10AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 263.)
2015-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-03AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

Bill Comments