NV AB200 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterinary medicine; prohibiting the practice of veterinary medicine except within the context of a veterinarian-client-patient relationship except in certain circumstances; authorizing a veterinarian to supervise a veterinary technician via veterinary telemedicine under certain circumstances; revising which acts constitute the practice of veterinary medicine; revising provisions governing service of process; eliminating the requirement for notarization of applications for certain licenses; revising provisions governing the renewal of certain licenses; authorizing veterinary technicians to administer certain vaccinations under certain circumstances; revising certain procedures required in response to complaints against a licensee; authorizing the Nevada State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to issue nondisciplinary letters of correction under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing veterinary medicine. (BDR 54-168)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 556 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 556.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 124.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |