NV AB20 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to services to assist persons with disabilities in obtaining employment. (BDR 38-225)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to services to assist persons with disabilities in obtaining employment. (BDR 38-225)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 67.
2017-05-18AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-05-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-15SenateRead second time.
2017-05-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-04-12AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-11AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-11AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-10AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 27.) To printer.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback