NV AB189 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the number of legislative measures that may be requested by certain persons and entities. (BDR 17-619)
Title
Revises the number of legislative measures that may be requested by certain persons and entities. (BDR 17-619)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=365 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB189.pdf |