NV AB187 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
Pending: Senate Government Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to periods of observance; designating the month of September of each year as Ovarian and Prostate Cancer Prevention and Awareness Month in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the month of September of each year as Ovarian and Prostate Cancer Prevention and Awareness Month in Nevada. (BDR 19-917)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2021-04-06SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-02AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 48.) To printer.
2021-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-05AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-04AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback