NV AB180 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the biennial audit requirements for the Public Employees' Retirement System. (BDR 23-569)
Title
Revises provisions governing the biennial audit requirements for the Public Employees' Retirement System. (BDR 23-569)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 57. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |