NV AB178 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; authorizing the Department of Taxation to approve and issue a certificate of transferable tax credits to a person who rehabilitates a historic building in this State under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of the amount of the transferable tax credits; requiring the Department to provide notice of certain hearings concerning an application for transferable tax credits; requiring a person who rehabilitates a historic building to return any portion of transferable tax credits to which he or she is not entitled; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for transferable tax credits for the rehabilitation of historic buildings. (BDR 32-297)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 315.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |