NV AB178 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the discipline of pupils. (BDR 34-248)
Title
Revises provisions governing the discipline of pupils. (BDR 34-248)
Sponsors
Rep. Tyrone Thompson [D] | Rep. Nelson Araujo [D] | Rep. Richard Carrillo [D] | Rep. Olivia Diaz [D] |
Rep. Amber Joiner [D] | Sen. Dina Neal [D] | Rep. Lynn Stewart [R] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] |
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 937 concurred in. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 937.) To printer. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 249.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |