NV AB171 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 87.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 87.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to natural resources; providing certain protections for a certain population of Rocky Mountain junipers; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes certain protections for certain swamp cedars. (BDR 47-468)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Chapter 87. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 108.) To printer. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |