NV AB169 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 9.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to maternal health; establishing the Maternal Mortality Review Committee; requiring the Committee to review each incident of maternal mortality and severe maternal morbidity in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Maternal Mortality Review Committee. (BDR 40-712)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07AssemblyChapter 9.
2019-05-03AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 117.) To printer.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-12AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback