NV AB169 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to contracts with a governmental entity. (BDR 27-793)
Title
Revises provisions relating to contracts with a governmental entity. (BDR 27-793)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 95.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |