NV AB168 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring a school to provide a plan of action based on restorative justice before suspending or expelling a pupil; prohibiting certain pupils from being suspended or expelled in certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the discipline of pupils. (BDR 34-539)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 245.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-12AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback