NV AB167 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring the board of trustees of a school district, the governing body of a charter school, a university, a state college or a community college to include certain information on an identification card issued to a pupil or student, as applicable; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-749)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01Senate(No further action taken.)
2021-05-03SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyTo committee.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-14AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 39.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2021-04-14AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-09AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback