NV AB165 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Nevada Educational Choice Scholarship Program. (BDR 34-747)
Title
Establishes the Nevada Educational Choice Scholarship Program. (BDR 34-747)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 22. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate. |
2015-03-31 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 90.) To printer. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |