NV AB163 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 342.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; revising certain requirements relating to a plan of water conservation; revising minimum standards for plumbing fixtures in new construction and expansions and renovations in certain structures; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing water conservation. (BDR 48-798)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 342. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 682 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 682.) To printer. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 137.) To printer. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |