NV AB162 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-12)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-12)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331.
Summary
Requires certain policies of health insurance and health care plans to provide coverage for screening for and treatment of autism. (BDR 57-44)
Title
Requires certain policies of health insurance and health care plans to provide coverage for screening for and treatment of autism. (BDR 57-44)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 331. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendment Nos. 699 and 908 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-23 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 908.) To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. | |
2009-05-20 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-19 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 699.) To printer. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 433.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-13 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=345 |