NV AB155 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Task Force on the Economics of the Middle Class in Nevada. (BDR S-820)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Task Force on the Economics of the Middle Class in Nevada. (BDR S-820)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-04-20AssemblyExempt pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6, subsection 4(a).
2017-04-17AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-04-17AssemblyTaken from General File.
2017-04-14AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-13AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-13AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 52.) To printer.
2017-04-11AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2017-04-11AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2017-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
2017-02-13AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback