NV AB151 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 316.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 316.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public welfare; requiring certain persons to report the commercial sexual exploitation of a child to an agency which provides child welfare services; requiring all persons to report the commercial sexual exploitation of a child to a law enforcement agency in certain circumstances; authorizing a fee for certain costs relating to information maintained by an agency which provides child welfare services; requiring an agency which provides child welfare services to adopt certain rules, policies or regulations; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the protection of children who are victims of commercial sexual exploitation. (BDR 38-457)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 316. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 890 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 890.) To printer. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |