NV AB151 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning mortgage lending. (BDR 54-567)
Title
Makes various changes concerning mortgage lending. (BDR 54-567)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Amendment No. 775 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 775.) To printer. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-15 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-14 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-14 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 156.) To printer. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-11 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=319 |