NV AB148 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing firearms. (BDR5-242)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing firearms. (BDR5-242)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-16Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2015-04-07SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-07SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-06AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-04-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 15, Excused: 3.)
2015-04-06AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-03AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 228.) To printer.
2015-04-03AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-03AssemblyTaken from Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-04-01AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2015-04-01AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2015-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback