NV AB148 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.
Summary
Requires certain health and safety training for construction workers and supervisors. (BDR 53-276)
Title
Requires certain health and safety training for construction workers and supervisors. (BDR 53-276)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Amendment No. 959 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 959.) To printer. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-18 | To printer. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) | |
2009-05-18 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 811.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-16 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-16 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-16 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 245.) To printer. | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-10 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=312 |