NV AB147 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties; authorizing a board of county commissioners to create by ordinance the office of county counsel; providing for the appointment of a county counsel; establishing the qualifications of a county counsel; authorizing a county counsel to appoint deputies and certain other staff; setting forth the powers and duties of a county counsel; revising the responsibilities of the district attorney when the office of county counsel is created; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes a board of county commissioners to create the office of county counsel. (BDR 20-119)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |