NV AB146 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Chapter 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; authorizing the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to develop plans, recommendations and policies to address water pollution resulting from diffuse sources; revising requirements for regulations adopted by the State Environmental Commission relating to water pollution; revising notice requirements relating to regulations adopted by the Commission; revising various provisions relating to the control of water pollution by the Director of the Department; revising requirements relating to the control of diffuse sources of water pollution; requiring the Director to consult or notify Indian tribes of certain actions relating to water pollution; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to water. (BDR 40-123)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Chapter 513. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 576 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 576.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 338.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |