NV AB143 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a Legislative Committee on Tax Expenditures and Incentives for Economic Development. (BDR 17-807)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a Legislative Committee on Tax Expenditures and Incentives for Economic Development. (BDR 17-807)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-04-12AssemblyTo committee.
2017-04-12AssemblyExempt pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6, subsection 4(a).
2017-04-12AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 51.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
2017-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
2017-02-13AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback