NV AB139 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the voluntary establishment of a program of dual language immersion in certain public elementary schools. (BDR 34-442)
Title
Provides for the voluntary establishment of a program of dual language immersion in certain public elementary schools. (BDR 34-442)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=292 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB139.pdf |