NV AB139 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 150.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 150.
Summary
Requires the compilation, analysis and reporting of information concerning low-income housing and housing suitable for use by persons with disabilities. (BDR 25-225)
Title
Requires the compilation, analysis and reporting of information concerning low-income housing and housing suitable for use by persons with disabilities. (BDR 25-225)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 150. | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-24 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 1, Excused: 4.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-30 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-03-30 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Taken from Second Reading File. | |
2009-03-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-09 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-06 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=300 |