NV AB138 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workers' compensation; requiring a claim for compensation under industrial insurance to be decided under a liberal construction in favor of the injured employee; revising provisions governing the duty of certain insurers to accept or deny claims for compensation; revising the standard for determining whether an injured employee is entitled to compensation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing workers' compensation. (BDR 53-708)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-13 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6205/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB138.pdf |