NV AB138 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 364.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts a juvenile competency standard. (BDR 5-188)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts a juvenile competency standard. (BDR 5-188)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 364.
2015-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-30AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment No. 670 concurred in.
2015-05-19AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-18SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-05-18SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2015-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-14SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-14SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2015-05-13SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 670.) To printer.
2015-05-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-16SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-15AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2015-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-04-14AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 559.) To printer.
2015-04-13AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-10AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 100.) To printer.
2015-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback