NV AB137 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 33.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; revising certain provisions related to establishing polling places within the boundaries of Indian reservations and Indian colonies; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to certain polling places. (BDR 24-800)

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 33.
2019-05-09AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-06SenateRead second time.
2019-05-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 451.) To printer.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-12AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-14AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback