NV AB137 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 106.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing contractors. (BDR 54-513)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing contractors. (BDR 54-513)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-19AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 106.
2015-05-13AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-08AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2015-05-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-05-06SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-05-05SenateRead second time.
2015-05-05SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
2015-05-04SenateTaken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2015-04-16SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-14AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 245.) To printer.
2015-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback